EP1168482 - T-circuit produced using microstrip technology with phase-shifting element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai A.Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minard, Philippe 17 Square du Bois Perrin 35700 Rennes / FR | 02 /
Louzir, Ali 6 rue de la Godmondière 35700 Rennes / FR | 03 /
Pintos, Jean-Francois 16 square Henry Dunant 35700 Rennes / FR | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/01] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON multimedia, 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01401650.5 | 22.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | FR20000008363 | 29.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0008363 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1168482 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01P1/18 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H01P1/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/40] |
Former [2002/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | T-Schaltung in Mikrostreifenleitungstechnik mit Phasenschieberelement | [2002/01] | English: | T-circuit produced using microstrip technology with phase-shifting element | [2002/01] | French: | Circuit à T en technique de ligne à microbande avec élément de déphasage | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 03.07.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05121935 ; | [A]US5216430 (RAHM JAMES K [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 49 - column 5, line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH04256201 ; | [A]US4967172 (ARIEL JOELLE [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 18; figure 5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930903), vol. 017, no. 487, Database accession no. (E - 1427), & JP05121935 A 19930518 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV LAB INC) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930122), vol. 017, no. 035, Database accession no. (E - 1310), & JP04256201 A 19920910 (DX ANTENNA CO LTD) [A] 1,2,6 * abstract * |