EP1167297 - Physical-chemical process for the treatment of swimming pool water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bio-UV SA 300 Rue Roland Garros 34130 Mauguio / FR | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gillmann, Benoît 300 Rue Rolland Garros 34130 Mauguio / FR | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Gosse, Michel Cabinet Claude Bes 2 bis Rue de Verdun 34000 Montpellier / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Gosse, Michel Cabinet Claude Bes 2 Bis Rue de Verdun 34000 Montpellier / FR | Application number, filing date | 01401751.1 | 29.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | FR20000008569 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0008569 | [2002/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1167297 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1167297 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | [2002/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1167297 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/00, C02F1/50, C02F1/32, C02F1/66, C02F9/00, C02F5/08 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
C02F1/66 (EP);
C02F1/50 (EP);
C02F5/08 (EP);
C02F1/32 (EP);
C02F2103/42 (EP);
C02F2209/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur physikalisch-chemischen Behandlung von Wasser eines Schwimmbeckens | [2002/01] | English: | Physical-chemical process for the treatment of swimming pool water | [2002/01] | French: | Procédé physico-chimique de traitement des eaux de piscine | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 11.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.2005 | CY | 19.10.2005 | FI | 19.10.2005 | GB | 19.10.2005 | IE | 19.10.2005 | IT | 19.10.2005 | NL | 19.10.2005 | TR | 19.10.2005 | DK | 19.01.2006 | GR | 19.01.2006 | SE | 19.01.2006 | DE | 20.01.2006 | ES | 30.01.2006 | PT | 20.03.2006 | LU | 29.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | CH | 30.06.2006 | LI | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
GB | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
IT | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
TR | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
DE | 20.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
LU | 29.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
GB | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
IT | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
DE | 20.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
GB | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
DE | 20.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
GB | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
DE | 20.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
GB | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
DE | 20.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
DE | 20.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
DE | 20.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
IE | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
GR | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 19.10.2005 | |
FI | 19.10.2005 | ||
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
DK | 19.01.2006 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
ES | 30.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | ||
PT | 20.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 19.10.2005 | |
NL | 19.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3910366 (UEBERALL PETER [DE]) [A] * claims 1-8 *; | [A]US5449658 (UNHOCH MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] * claims 1-15 * |