EP1256937 - Emotion recognition method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony France S.A. 20-26, rue Morel 92110 Clichy / FR | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oudeyer, Pierre-Yves, c/o Sony France S.A. Computer Science Laboratory, 6, rue Amyot 75004 Paris / FR | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Bertrand, Didier, et al c/o S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT & AUTRES CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRIELLE 38, Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01401879.0 | 13.07.2001 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | EP20010401203 | 11.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01401203 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256937 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256937 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256937 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/18, G10L17/00 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
G10L13/033 (EP,US);
G10L13/00 (EP,US);
G10L13/10 (EP,US);
G10L17/26 (EP,US);
G10L13/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/39] | G10L17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2002/46] | G10L15/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/24] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erkennung von Emotionen | [2002/46] | English: | Emotion recognition method and device | [2002/46] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la reconnaissance d'émotions | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/16] | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4142067 (WILLIAMSON JOHN D) [X] 1,12-15,23-26 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 57; figures 1,2A-2K * [Y] 2-11,16-22; | [X]US3855416 (FULLER F) [X] 1,12,15,23,26 * figures 7,8 *; | [Y] - VAN BEZOOIJEN R ET AL, "THE EFFECTS OF LOW-PASS FILTERING AND RANDOM SPLICING ON THE PERCEPTION OF SPEECH", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1986), Database accession no. PREV198783009008, XP002289963 [Y] 2-4,9,10,16-18,20,21 * abstract * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF PSYCHOLINGUISTIC RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 15, no. 5, ISSN 0090-6905, pages 403 - 418 | [Y] - GUDRUN KLASMEYER, "AN AUTOMATIC DESCRIPTION TOOL FOR TIME CONTOURS AND LONG-TERM AVERAGE VOICE FEATURES IN LARGE EMOTIONAL SPEECH DATABASES", ISCA WORKSHOP ON SPEECH AND EMOTION, BELFAST, (20000905), pages 1 - 6, XP007005767 [Y] 5-8,11,19,22 * paragraphs [02.2] , [02.3] , [02.5] * | [A] - K.R. SCHERER, T. JOHNSTONE, J. SANGSUE, "L'état émotionnel du locuteur: facteur négligé mais non négligeable pour la technologie de la parole", ACTES DES XXIIIÈMES JOURNÉES D'ÉTUDES SUR LA PAROLE, MARTIGNY, SWITZERLAND, (1998), pages 1 - 9, XP002289960 [A] 5-8,11,19,22 * table 2 * | [A] - SINÉAD MCGILLOWAY, RODDY COWIE, ELLEN DOUGLAS-COWIE, STAN GIELEN, MACHIEL WESTERDIJK, SYBERT STROEVE, "Approaching Automatic Recognition of Emotion from Voice: a Rough Benchmark", ISCA WORKSHOP ON SPEECH AND EMOTION, PROCEEDINGS ONLINE, BELFAST, (20000905), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.qub.ac.uk/en/tsca/proceedings/pdfs/mcilloway.pdf, (20040723), XP002289961 [A] 5-8,11,19,22 * page 5, column R, line 41 - line 54; table 1 * | [PX] - MCNALLY RICHARD J ET AL, "The voice of emotional memory: Content-filtered speech in panic disorder, social phobia, and major depressive disorder", BEHAVIOUR RESEARCH AND THERAPY, (200111), vol. 39, no. 11, ISSN 0005-7967, pages 1329 - 1337, XP002289962 [PX] 1-4,15-18,26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0005-7967(00)00100-5 |