EP1176843 - System and method for selecting a channel in a TDD asymmetric radiocommunication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lablanca Almeida, Francisco Javier Tomás Bréton, 49-Esc. E-4 A 28045 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Aguilar Sanchez, Luciano Jesus Moreno Nieto, 7-1 E 28005 Madrid / ES | 03 /
Lopez, Almansa, Eugenio Jacinto Verdaguer, 3-5 I 28019 Madrid / ES | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/23] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 30, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/05] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Espana, S.A, Patent department, Ramirez de Prado, 5 28045 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 01401941.8 | 19.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | ES20000001862 | 25.07.2000 Original published format: ES 200001862 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1176843 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
H04W72/542 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/42] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Auswahl eines TDD Kanals in einem unsymmetrischen Funkkommunikationssystem | [2002/05] | English: | System and method for selecting a channel in a TDD asymmetric radiocommunication system | [2002/05] | French: | Méthode et système de sélection de canal TDD dans un système de radiocommunication asymmétrique | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/32] | 03.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/32] | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [2002/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.09.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.09.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.09.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0399612 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO9208324 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al); | [PA]EP1063855 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) |