EP1180561 - Block for connecting with reinforcement and retaining wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freyssinet International (STUP) 1bis, rue du Petit Clamart 78148 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [2002/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orsat, Pierre 2 Allée Jules Massenet 78590 Noisy le Roi / FR | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Loisel, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/39] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2002/08] | Bloch, Gérard, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402004.4 | 25.07.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | FR20000010432 | 08.08.2000 Original published format: FR 0010432 | [2002/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180561 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/02 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
E02D29/0233 (EP);
E02D29/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/08] | Title | German: | Befestigungsblock für Bewehrung und Stützmauer | [2002/08] | English: | Block for connecting with reinforcement and retaining wall | [2002/08] | French: | Bloc d'attache d'une bande d'armature et paroi de parement | [2002/08] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 01.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4470728 (BROADBENT STEPHEN [GB]) [A] 1,5,6,9,12,13 * figures 4,8 *; | [A]US4671706 (GIARDINI ARNALDO [CA]) [A] 1,3,8,12 * figures 8,9 *; | [A]US5816749 (BAILEY II JOSEPH S [US]) [A] 7,8 * abstract *; | [A]US5484235 (HILFIKER WILLIAM K [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US6079908 (ANDERSON PETER L [US]) [A] * figures 2,38 * |