EP1182362 - Adhesive anchor and anchoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60025-5811 / US | ||
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025-5811 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irwin, James C. 225 Nantucket Blvd. Scarborough, Ontario M1P 2P2 / CA | 02 /
Timmerman, Mark S. 592 N. Lyle Avenue Elgin, Illinois 60123 / US | 03 /
Ernst, Richard J. 5593 Havenridge Way San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Bloch, Gérard, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402068.9 | 31.07.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | US20000640205 | 16.08.2000 Original published format: US 640205 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182362 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1182362 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1182362 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/14 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
F16B13/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/09] | Title | German: | Mit Klebemittel fixiertes Ankerelement und Verankerungssystem | [2002/09] | English: | Adhesive anchor and anchoring system | [2002/09] | French: | Elément d'ancrage fixé par matière adhésive et système d'ancrage | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 19.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2007 | CH | 17.01.2007 | CY | 17.01.2007 | DK | 17.01.2007 | FI | 17.01.2007 | LI | 17.01.2007 | TR | 17.01.2007 | SE | 17.04.2007 | GR | 18.04.2007 | PT | 18.06.2007 | IE | 31.07.2007 | LU | 31.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CY | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
IE | 31.07.2007 | ||
LU | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CY | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
IE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
IE | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 17.01.2007 | |
PT | 18.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1965639 (MATTHEW GLASS) [Y] 6,14 * page 1, column L, line 43 - line 46; figure 2 *; | [XY]US5888334 (ABRAHAM FREDERIC C [US]) [X] 1-5,7-13,15-26 * abstract * * column 4, line 34 - line 67 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 42 * * column 8, line 4 - line 16 * * column 9, line 9 - column 10, line 4 * * column 10, line 21 - line 28 * * column 10, line 44 - column 11, line 5 * * column 14, line 16 - line 40; claim - * * figure - * [Y] 6,14; | [X]EP0936361 (GIANNUZZI ANTHONY C [US]) [X] 23,24,27 * abstract * * column 6, line 25 - line 38 ** figure - * | by applicant | USRE35659E |