EP1182092 - Arrangement for mounting an electrical unit in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Renault 13-15 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fumex, Michel 10 rue Dampierre 78460 Chevreuse / FR | 02 /
Breton, Gilles 26 rue Fenelon 91400 Saclay / FR | 03 /
Journiac, Christian 3 avenue Georges Clémenceau 78500 Sartrouville / FR | 04 /
Lavat, Hervé 141 domaine de la Chartreuse 27940 Aubevoye / FR | 05 /
Vacca, Christian 53 Boulevard de Mondétour 91400 Orsay / FR | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Davies, Owen Robert Treharne RENAULT TECHNOCENTRE Département Propriété Intellectuelle Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36 1, avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt cedex / FR | [2008/43] |
Former [2004/02] | Davies, Owen Robert Treharne Renault SAS Technocentre TCR-GRA-1-55 1, avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402074.7 | 01.08.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | FR20000010932 | 25.08.2000 Original published format: FR 0010932 | [2002/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1182092 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1182092 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, H01M2/10 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
B60R11/00 (EP);
H01M50/264 (EP,US);
B60R11/02 (EP);
B60R16/04 (EP);
B60R25/00 (EP);
B60R2011/0038 (EP);
B60R2011/0052 (EP);
B60R2011/0071 (EP);
B60R2011/0075 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB [2002/46] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung einer Elektrikeinheit in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2002/09] | English: | Arrangement for mounting an electrical unit in a vehicle | [2002/09] | French: | Agencement pour le montage d'une unité électrique d'un véhicule automobile | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 28.08.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI | 26.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.10.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.10.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.06.2004 | [2005/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB208035 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD, et al); | [A]US5484667 (SAHLI RICHARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 18 - line 40 * * column 4, line 60 - line 66; figures 1-3 * * abstract *; | [A]US5639571 (WATERS JOHN EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 7; figures 1-5 * * abstract *; | [A]US5777843 (YOUNCE THOMAS MATTHEW [US]); | [A]JPH10250622 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US5882213 (WITEK JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 36 - line 43 * * column 3, line 21 - line 28; figures 1-3 * * abstract * |