EP1180740 - Method of storing data in a multimedia file using relative time bases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Comps, Christophe 34, avenue Baron Haussmann 33610 Cestas / FR | 02 /
Boudet, Daniel 8, rue Vasco de Gama 75015 Paris / FR | 03 /
Sarremejean, Xavier 25, rue des Ancolies 95490 Vaureal / FR | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2002/08] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propr. Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402115.8 | 06.08.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | FR20000010627 | 14.08.2000 Original published format: FR 0010627 | [2002/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180740 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
G06F16/489 (US);
Y10S707/99931 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Speichern von Daten in einer Multimediadatei unter Verwendung einer relativen Zeitbasis | [2002/08] | English: | Method of storing data in a multimedia file using relative time bases | [2002/08] | French: | Procédé de mémorisation de données dans un fichier multimedia utilisant des bases de temps relatives | [2002/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 12.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/25] | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2005 | Request for further processing for: | 31.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9427234 (TALIGENT INC [US]) [A] 1* page 11, line 4 - page 14, line 32; figures 2,8,9 *; | [A]US5452435 (MALOUF FREDERICK L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 37 - column 10, line 12; figures 2,4 *; | [X] - ROTHERMEL K ET AL, "CLOCK HIERARCHIES: AN ABSTRACTION FOR GROUPING AND CONTROLLING MEDIA STREAMS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (1996), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 174 - 184, XP000548820 [X] 1-3 * page 176, column L, line 22 - column R, line 39; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.481703 |