EP1213811 - Modular box for flush mounting of one or several electrical apparatus in a cable duct less deep than the apparatus and housing made by assembling at least two of these boxes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLANET WATTOHM Avenue Félix Louat, Zace 60300 Senlis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Planet Wattohm Avenue Félix Louat, Zace 60300 Senlis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coutant, Régis 16, rue du Buisson 60117 Vauciennes / FR | 02 /
Xerri, Frédéric 15, rue Bougainville 87000 Limoges / FR | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2003/18] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2002/24] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402364.2 | 13.09.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | FR20000011799 | 15.09.2000 Original published format: FR 0011799 | [2002/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1213811 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1213811 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/12 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H02G3/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [2003/10] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Modulare Dose zum versenkten Einbau von einem Gerät oder mehrerer Geräte in einen Kabelkanal mit einer kleineren Tiefe und mit mindestens zwei Dosen hergestelltes Gehäuse | [2002/25] | English: | Modular box for flush mounting of one or several electrical apparatus in a cable duct less deep than the apparatus and housing made by assembling at least two of these boxes | [2002/24] | French: | Boîte modulaire pour l'implantation encastrée d'un ou plusieurs appareillages électriques dans un conduit de câblage de profondeur inférieure à celle des appareillages et boîtier formé de l'assemblage d'au moins deux de ces boîtes | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/24] | Modularer Dose zum versenkten Einbau von einem Gerät oder mehrerer Geräte in einen Kabelkanal mit einer kleineren Tiefe und mit mindestens zwei Dosen hergestellte Gehause | Examination procedure | 03.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.12.2011 | GB | 13.09.2012 | [2013/34] |
Former [2012/24] | SE | 14.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7040540U (KLEINHUIS) [A] 1,6-11* figure - *; | [YA]FR2724498 (JVK PLASTICS NV [BE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-5,21,22; | [YA]EP0721245 (PLANET WATTOHM SA [FR]) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 19; | [D]FR2729255 (PLANET WATTOHM SNC [FR]); | [A]EP0971466 (KLEINHUIS HERMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure - * |