EP1295885 - Substituted 2-pyridinyl-6,7,8,9-tetrahydropyrimido(1,2-a)pyrimidin-4-one and 7-pyridinyl-2,3-dihydroimidazo(1,2-a)pyrimidin-5(1H)one derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Mitsubishi-Tokyo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2-6, Nihonbashi-honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8405 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi-Tokyo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2-6, Nihonbashi-honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallet, Thierry 105 boulevard de Palaiseau 91120 Palaiseau / FR | 02 /
Lardenois, Patrick 18 rue varengue 92340 Bourg-la-reine / FR | 03 /
Lochead, Alistair W. 95, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton / FR | 04 /
Nedelec, Alain 97, rue Victor Hugo 92700 Colombes / FR | 05 /
Marguerie, Séverine 7, bis rue du loiret 75013 Paris / FR | 06 /
Saady, Mourad 224, faubourg saint-antoine 75012 Paris / FR | 07 /
Yaiche, Philippe 2, place marc sangnier 93260 Les Lilas / FR | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Kugel, Dominique, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Kugel, Dominique, et al Sanofi-Synthelabo 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402432.7 | 21.09.2001 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1295885 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P3/10, A61P25/28 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [2003/51] |
Former [2003/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Substituierte 2-pyridinyl-6,7,8,9-tetrahydropyrimido(1,2-a)pyrimidin-4-on- und 7-pyridinyl-2,3-dihydroimidazo(1,2-a)pyrimidin-5(1H)onderivate | [2003/13] | English: | Substituted 2-pyridinyl-6,7,8,9-tetrahydropyrimido(1,2-a)pyrimidin-4-one and 7-pyridinyl-2,3-dihydroimidazo(1,2-a)pyrimidin-5(1H)one derivatives | [2003/13] | French: | Dérivés de 2-pyridinyl-6,7,8,9-tetrahydropyrimido(1,2-a)pyrimidin-4-one et 7-pyridinyl-2,3-dihydroimidazo(1,2-a)pyrimidin-5(1H)one substitués | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 31.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0144246 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-78 *; | [A]WO0142224 (MITSUBISHI TOKYO PHARM INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 8; claims 1-12 *; | [A]WO0018758 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 8; claims 1-12 *; | [A]WO9965897 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-88 *; | [A]WO9816528 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-27 *; | [A]WO9824780 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-45 * |