EP1195539 - Device absorbing shock energy and automotive vehicle door comprising such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAI AUTOMOTIVE ALLIBERT INDUSTRIE 2 Rue de l'Egalité 92748 Nanterre / FR | [2002/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laborie, Jean-Michel c/o SAI Automotive Allibert Ind., 2 rue Emile Zola 60114 Meru / FR | 02 /
Demulder, Damien c/o SAI Automotive Allibert Ind., 2 rue Emile Zola 60114 Meru / FR | 03 /
Febvay, Patrick c/o SAI Automotive Allibert Ind., 2 rue Emile Zola 60114 Meru / FR | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Lerner, François Cabinet Lerner & Associés, 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Lerner, François Lerner & Associés, 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402440.0 | 24.09.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | FR20000012893 | 09.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0012893 | [2002/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1195539 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1195539 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/12, B60R21/04 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
F16F7/121 (EP,US);
B60R21/04 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0421 (EP,US);
B60R21/0428 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2003/01] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Absorbieren von Stossenergie und Kraftfahrzeugtür mit so einer Vorrichtung | [2002/15] | English: | Device absorbing shock energy and automotive vehicle door comprising such a device | [2002/15] | French: | Dispositif d'absorption d'énergie lors d'un choc, et portière de véhicule automobile comprenant un tel dispositif | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 11.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 28.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0916277 (RETAMA TECH CORP [US]) [X] 1 * figure 6 *; | [DA]FR2784151 (ALLIBERT IND [FR]) [DA] 8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2758115 (ROCKWELL LVS [FR]) [A] 1,8 * figure - *; | [A]US4890877 (ASHTIANI-ZARANDI MANSOUR [US], et al); | [A]US3251076 (BURKE DANIEL M); | [A]DE4307836 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]US5016417 (MENTKEN ROBERT [US]) | by applicant | FR2784151 |