EP1204220 - Method for obtaining a transmission gain function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | ||
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. Keienbergweg 58 1101 AG Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voyer, Nicolas, Mitsubishi Electric Ite Immeuble Germanium, 80 av. des Buttes de Coesmes 35700 Rennes / FR | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet le Guen & Maillet, 5, Place Newquay, B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402661.1 | 15.10.2001 | [2002/19] | Priority number, date | FR20000014361 | 31.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0014361 | [2002/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1204220 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1204220 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
H04B7/0619 (EP,US);
H04B7/0615 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erfassung einer Übertragungsgewinnfunktion | [2002/19] | English: | Method for obtaining a transmission gain function | [2002/19] | French: | Procédé pour l'acquisition d'une fonction de gain d'émission | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 21.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2003 | BE | 13.08.2003 | CH | 13.08.2003 | FI | 13.08.2003 | IT | 13.08.2003 | LI | 13.08.2003 | NL | 13.08.2003 | TR | 13.08.2003 | CY | 15.10.2003 | IE | 15.10.2003 | LU | 15.10.2003 | MC | 31.10.2003 | DK | 13.11.2003 | GR | 13.11.2003 | SE | 13.11.2003 | DE | 14.11.2003 | ES | 24.11.2003 | PT | 13.01.2004 | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
TR | 13.08.2003 | ||
CY | 15.10.2003 | ||
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
LU | 15.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
DE | 14.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
CY | 15.10.2003 | ||
IE | 15.10.2003 | ||
LU | 15.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
DE | 14.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
CY | 15.10.2003 | ||
LU | 15.10.2003 | ||
MC | 31.10.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
DE | 14.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
CY | 15.10.2003 | ||
LU | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
DE | 14.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
CY | 15.10.2003 | ||
LU | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
DE | 14.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
CY | 15.10.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
DE | 14.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
DE | 14.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 13.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0999658 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 36 - column 11, line 45 * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO0036764 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 6 ** figure 3 *; | [A] - GOLDBERG J ET AL, "DOWNLINK BEAMFORMING FOR CELLULAR MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS", PHOENIX, MAY 4 - 7, 1997,NEW YORK, IEEE,US, (19970504), vol. CONF. 47, ISBN 0-7803-3660-7, pages 632 - 636, XP000736684 [A] 1,10 * page 632, column L, paragraph 1 - page 632, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 634, column L, paragraph 3 - page 635, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1997.600405 |