EP1205727 - Pyrotechnic delay initiator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etat Français représenté par le Délégué Général pour l'Armement 16 bis, Avenue Prieur de la Côte d'Or 94114 Arcueil Cedex / FR | For all designated states JASON ENGINEERING S.A. Avenue Gribaumont, 154 B-1200 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Etat Francais représenté par le Délégue Général pour l'Armement 16 bis, Avenue prieur de la Côte d'Or 94114 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states JASON ENGINEERING S.A. Avenue Gribaumont, 154 B-1200 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boyer, Jean-Louis L'Ermitage les Pourcieux, Vallon de Vandrèche 83610 Collobrières / FR | 02 /
Gilson, André 154, Avenue Gribaumont 1200 Bruxelles / BE | 03 /
Rion, Raymond 6, rue Haie Boisnard 5020 Champion / BE | [2004/26] |
Former [2002/20] | 01 /
Boyer, Jean-Louis L'Ermitage les Pourdeux, Vallon de Vandrèche 83610 Collobrières / FR | ||
02 /
Gilson, André 154, Avenue Gribaumont 1200 Bruxelles / BE | |||
03 /
Rion, Raymond 6, rue Haie Boisnard 5020 Champion / BE | Application number, filing date | 01402863.3 | 08.11.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | FR20000014390 | 09.11.2000 Original published format: FR 0014390 | [2002/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205727 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205727 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F42C15/31, F42B3/16 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
F42B3/16 (EP,US);
F42C15/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Pyrotechnischer Verzögerungszünder | [2002/20] | English: | Pyrotechnic delay initiator | [2002/20] | French: | Moyens d'initiation pyrotechnique retardateurs | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 19.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2004 | FI | 29.12.2004 | IE | 29.12.2004 | TR | 29.12.2004 | DK | 29.03.2005 | GR | 29.03.2005 | PT | 29.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 29.12.2004 | ||
TR | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1147516 (HANS ASSMANN DIPL ING) [A] 1,3 * Figure unique *; | [A]FR2557969 (FRANCE ETAT ARMEMENT [FR]) [A] 1,3 * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 9; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9425819 (ASSMAN HANS [DE], et al) [A] 1* page 4, line 5 - page 7, line 32; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE1428801 | US3823669 | FR2353041 | FR2458790 | FR2465189 | FR2721394 |