EP1225593 - Magnetic device based on spin polarization and rotating magnetization, memory and writing procedure utlilizing said device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/44] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Redon, Olivier 162, avenue Victor Hugo Le Grand Pré, 38170 Seyssinet / FR | 02 /
Dieny, Bernard 180, allée des Erables 38250 Lans-en-Vercors / FR | 03 /
Rodmacq, Bernard 2, Montée Baboud 38113 Veurey-Voroize / FR | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/37] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/42] | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/30] | Signore, Robert c/o BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01403131.4 | 05.12.2001 | [2002/30] | Priority number, date | FR20000015893 | 07.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0015893 | [2002/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1225593 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225593 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/16, H01F10/32 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H10B61/20 (EP,US);
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G11C11/161 (EP,US);
G11C11/1659 (EP,US);
G11C11/1675 (EP,US);
H01F10/3254 (EP,US);
H01F10/3268 (EP,US);
H01F10/3286 (EP,US);
H10N50/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2003/16] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Magnetische Anordnung basiert auf Spinpolarisierung und Rotationsmagnetisierung, Speicher und Schreibverfahren unter Verwendung einer solcher | [2002/30] | English: | Magnetic device based on spin polarization and rotating magnetization, memory and writing procedure utlilizing said device | [2002/30] | French: | Dispositif magnétique à polarisation de spin et à rotation d'aimantation, mémoire et procédé d'écriture utilisant ce dispositif | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 25.01.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.05.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 09.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5856897 (MAURI DANIELE [US]) |