EP1217061 - Processing a hydrocarbon feedstock comprising a fixed bed countercurrent hydrotreatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2005/48] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vuillemot, Daniel 27, rue de l'Haye 69230 Saint Genis Laval / FR | 02 /
Carpot, Laurence 101, rue de la Maconnière 69390 Vernaison / FR | 03 /
Chapus, Thierry 23, rue des Flesselles 69001 Lyon / FR | 04 /
Rocher, Philippe 8, allée des Tulipes 69720 Saint Bonnet de Mure / FR | 05 /
Morel, Frédéric 16, rue Doulline 69340 Francheville / FR | [2002/26] | Application number, filing date | 01403141.3 | 06.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | FR20000016824 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0016824 | [2002/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1217061 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1217061 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/46, C10G65/08 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
C10G65/08 (EP,US);
C10G45/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [2003/12] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung einer Kohlenwasserstoffbeschickung durch eine Gegenstrom-Hydrobehandlung in einem Festbett | [2002/26] | English: | Processing a hydrocarbon feedstock comprising a fixed bed countercurrent hydrotreatment | [2002/26] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'une charge Hydrocarbonée comprenant une étape d'hydrotraitement en lit fixe à contre-courant | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 28.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3147210 (HASS ROBERT H, et al) [DA] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US3437588 (KOVACH STEPHEN M, et al); | [A]WO9703150 (MEERN BV ENGELHARD DE [NL], et al) |