EP1219764 - Method for making a civil engineering construction, especially swimming pools or water basins and means for carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Queirel, Joel 39, rue Jules-Lebocey 10000 Troyes / FR | [2002/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Lerner, François 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | [2002/27] | Application number, filing date | 01403288.2 | 18.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | FR20010000014 | 02.01.2001 Original published format: FR 0100014 | [2002/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1219764 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04H4/00 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
E04H4/0075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT, PT [2003/13] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für Bauwerke, insbesondere für Schwimmbäder oder Wasserbecken und Vorrichtung zum Durchführen des Verfahrens | [2002/27] | English: | Method for making a civil engineering construction, especially swimming pools or water basins and means for carrying out this method | [2002/27] | French: | Procédé pour la réalisation d'ouvrages de génie civil, et notamment de piscines ou bassins de retenue d'eau, et moyens pour sa mise en oeuvre | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 04.01.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.05.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, SE, TR | 13.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/51] | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.02.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0046456 (WALLIN ARNE B [CA]) [A] 1,4 * page 3, line 6 - page 6, line 23 * * page 9, line 19 - page 11, line 13 * * figures 7-11 *; | [A]FR2518613 (DESJOYAUX CATHERINE [FR]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1035273 (ABRIBLUE [FR]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document * |