EP1322056 - Method and network element for avoiding misconnections in a shared protection ring telecommunication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sestito, Vincenzo Via Paolo Paruta, 25 20127 Milano / IT | 02 /
Grandi, Pietro Vittorio Via Fratelli Rosselli, 9 20139 Milano / IT | 03 /
Mazzini, Andrea Corso Europa, 49/B 20060 Pessano con Bornago (Milano) / IT | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Vimercate Via Trento, 30 20059 Vimercate (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al Alcatel, Intellectual Property Department, Vimercate, Via Trento, 30 20059 Vimercate (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 01403295.7 | 19.12.2001 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1322056 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/08 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
H04J3/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Netzelement zur vermeidung von Fehlverbindungen in einem gemeinsamen Ring- Telekommunikationsnetzwerk | [2003/26] | English: | Method and network element for avoiding misconnections in a shared protection ring telecommunication network | [2003/26] | French: | Méthode et élément de réseau pour éviter les connexions érronées dans un réseau de télécommunications en anneau à protection partagée | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 26.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/40] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.02.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6122250 (TANIGUCHI ATSUKI [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,8-12,14-16 * abstract * * column 9, line 29 - column 10, line 45 * * column 13, line 12 - line 51 * * column 18, line 36 - line 67 * [A] 2,3; | [X]US5442620 (KREMER WILHELM [US]) [X] 1,2,8-12,14-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 16 - line 36 * * column 6, line 3 - line 55 * * column 7, line 34 - line 66 * |