Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
30.09.2005 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
13.09.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
13.09.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
23.05.2005 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
01.04.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
07.01.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.11.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.11.2004 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
18.06.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
18.06.2004 | Deletion: Reply to examination report | |
19.03.2004 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
14.01.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.11.2003 | First examination report | |
01.11.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
04.06.2003 | Change - extension states | |
14.03.2003 | Change - representative | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
07.02.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
28.06.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
17.05.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |