Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020059242 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9750401 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1219881 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2005 | B1 | EP1219881 | 03.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR032215 | 29.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0106596 | 17.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60114978T | 27.07.2006 | T2 | DE60114978D1 | 22.12.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2248257T | 16.03.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2819037 | 28.03.2003 | B1 | FR2819037 | 05.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA01013163 | 21.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL351427 | 01.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG119144 | 28.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200200033 | 16.07.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | FR0017302 | 29.12.2000 |