EP1292158 - Call re-establishment method and exchange nodes therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berranger, Jean Alexis 8, allée du Pré Blanc 38240 Meylan / FR | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2009/26] | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett Packard CCF IP Section - Legal Department 5, Avenue Raymond Chanas-Eybens 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/11] | Lloyd, Richard Graham Intellectual Property Section, Legal Department, HEWLETT-PACKARD FRANCE, Etablissement de Grenoble 38053 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01410111.7 | 06.09.2001 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292158 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1292158 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/66, H04Q3/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
H04M3/2254 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0025 (EP,US);
H04Q3/0029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Wiederherstellen eines Anrufs und dazu geeignete Vermittlungsknoten | [2003/11] | English: | Call re-establishment method and exchange nodes therefor | [2003/11] | French: | Procédé de rétablissement d'appel et commutateurs adaptés | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Request for further processing for: | 18.01.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.2010 | BE | 21.07.2010 | CY | 21.07.2010 | DK | 21.07.2010 | FI | 21.07.2010 | IT | 21.07.2010 | NL | 21.07.2010 | SE | 21.07.2010 | TR | 21.07.2010 | IE | 06.09.2010 | LU | 06.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | GR | 22.10.2010 | ES | 01.11.2010 | PT | 22.11.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 06.09.2010 | ||
LU | 06.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 06.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
NL | 21.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5345503 (LEE SEONG-GEUN [KR]) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 8 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-5E *; | [A]US5805691 (DENDI RANGA R [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 28; figures 1-5D *; | [X]US5963633 (DENDI RANGA R [US]) [X] 1-4,7,14-17 * column 2, line 51 - column 8, line 21; figures 1-9C *; | [DA] - ITU-T, Specification of Signalling System No. 7 - ISDN supplementary services - Q.730, GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, (199709), XP002192135 [DA] 1-18 * page 28 - page 30 * |