EP1211706 - High tension switchgear with double mouvement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VA TECH Transmission & Distribution SA 1, rue de la Neva 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2004/32] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Schneider Electric High Voltage SA 13 Quai Paul Louis Merlin 38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chareyron, Vincent, Schneider Electric Ind. SA Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
Chevrier, Pierre, Schneider Electric Ind. SA Sce Propriété Industrielle - Usine A7 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 03 /
Gaudart, Georges, Schneider Electric Ind. SA Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 04 /
Jaillet, Fabrice, Schneider Electric Ind. SA Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 05 /
Toyoda, Mitsuru, Schneider Electric Ind. SA Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | 06 /
Vinatier, Michel, Schneider Electric Ind. SA Sce Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Avenue de Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2004/12] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA, 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2002/23] | Broydé, Marc, et al Schneider Electric Industries SA, Service Propriété Industrielle - A7 F-38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01410154.7 | 27.11.2001 | [2002/23] | Priority number, date | FR20000015525 | 30.11.2000 Original published format: FR 0015525 | [2002/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1211706 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1211706 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/90 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
H01H33/904 (EP);
H01H33/78 (EP);
H01H2033/028 (EP);
H01H3/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI, SE [2003/09] |
Former [2002/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hochspannungsschaltgerät mit Doppelbewegung | [2002/23] | English: | High tension switchgear with double mouvement | [2002/23] | French: | Appareillage de coupure électrique haute tension à double mouvement | [2002/23] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 26.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2491675 (ALSTHOM ATLANTIQUE [FR]) [DA] 1 * pages 7-8; figure - *; | [A]FR2762925 (GEC ALSTHOM T & D SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraphs 2-6 *; | [DA]EP0313813 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0809269 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * |