EP1127490 - Composition and liquid containing this composition for the preservation of human or animal corpses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISOFROID - E.H.F. ZA de la Noyeraie 69940 Sarcey / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states SARL "E.H.F." ZA dela Noyeraie 69940 Sarcey / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clerc, M Paul 30126 St Laurent des Arbres / FR | 02 /
Sigoure, M. Jean Rue Ponson Magnin 69620 Le Bois d'Oingt / FR | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Guerre, Dominique Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Guerre, Dominique Cabinet Germain et Maureau, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01420052.1 | 23.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | FR20000002408 | 25.02.2000 Original published format: FR 0002408 | [2001/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127490 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/00 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
A01N1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/21] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung und Flüssigkeit zur Konservierung von menschlichen oder tierischen Körpern, die diese Zusammensetzung enthalten | [2001/35] | English: | Composition and liquid containing this composition for the preservation of human or animal corpses | [2001/35] | French: | Composition et fluide de conservation du corps humain ou animal contenant cette composition | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 31.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/02] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH08187260 ; | [XY]SU971191 ; | [XY]EP0109993 (SOSNOWSKI ZENON M) [X] 1 * page 20; example XXXI * * page 20, line 22 - line 33 * [Y] 1-9,11; | [Y]US5827511 (CAMPBELL JAMES W [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,11 * the whole document *; | JPH02245159 [ ] (NIPPON PUROPORISU KK) | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08187260 A 19960723 (UENO MOTOTAKA) [X] 10 * abstract * [Y] 1-9,11 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 36, Database accession no. 1983-757314, XP002152339 & SU971191 A 19821107 (VORON MEDICAL INST) [X] 1-3,5,10,11 * abstract * [Y] 4,6-9 | [X] - CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, URL: STN-INTERNATIONAL, XP002152338 [X] 1 * abstract * |