EP1145662 - Dispenser for cosmetic material or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENLOPEN MANUFACTURING CO., INC. 20 Melville Park Road Melville New York 11747 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states HENLOPEN MANUFACTURING CO., INC. 20 Melville Park Road Melville, New York 11747 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dorsa, Salvatore 813 Sixth Street East Nortport, New York 11731 / US | 02 /
Schrepf, Volker 121 Keswick Drive East Lip, New York 11730 / US | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Pigasse, Daniel Alcan France SAS Propriété Industrielle 725 Rue Aristide Bergès BP25, Voreppe 38341 Moirans Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Pigasse, Daniel Pechiney, Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01420087.7 | 10.04.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | US20000196405P | 12.04.2000 Original published format: US 196405 P | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1145662 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1145662 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/06 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
A45D34/06 (EP,US);
A45D40/18 (EP);
A45D40/265 (EP);
A46B3/18 (EP,US);
A46B9/021 (EP,US);
A46B2200/106 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/07] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Spender für kosmetische Erzeugnisse oder dergleichen | [2001/42] | English: | Dispenser for cosmetic material or the like | [2001/42] | French: | Distributeur de produits cosmétiques ou autres | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 08.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5970990 (DUNTON DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2236240 (STANLEY LOWEN) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE3808853 (BREUHAN ELEFANT CHEMIE [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]CH623467 (TRABATTONI ROBERTO [IT]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2 * |