EP1178039 - Derivatives of phenyl(thio)urea and phenyl(thio)carbamate fungicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience S.A. 55, avenue René Cassin 69009 Lyon / FR | [2007/15] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience S.A. 55, avenue René-Cassin 69009 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A. 55, avenue René Cassin, CP 106 69266 Lyon Cedex 09 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerusz, Vincent 39, Rue Louis Bouquet 69009 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Mansfield, Darren James 25 montée Bonafous 69004 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Perez, José 9, Chemin de Montpellas 69009 Lyon / FR | 04 /
Tickle, David Fyfield Road Ongar Essex CM5 OHW / GB | 05 /
Vors, Jean-Pierre 16 Chemin de Montpellas 69009 Lyon / FR | 06 /
Baldwin, Derek Chesterford Park Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 07 /
Hough, Thomas Lawley 82 Balsham Road Linton Cambridge CB1 6LW / GB | 08 /
Mitchell, Dale Robert 3 St. Joohn's Close Gt. Chesterford, Essex CB10 1PB / GB | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Gerhards, Frank, et al Bayer CropScience AG Patents & Licensing Department Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Gerhards, Frank, et al Bayer CropScience AG Patents & Licensing Department Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01420173.5 | 01.08.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | FR20000010305 | 04.08.2000 Original published format: FR 0010305 | [2002/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1178039 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1178039 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C327/48, C07C275/36, C07D277/36, C07D271/10, C07D271/06, C07D213/61, C07D235/14, C07D285/08, A01N47/30, A01N43/82, A01N43/52 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,US);
A01N43/64 (EP,US);
A01N43/78 (EP,US);
A01N43/88 (EP,US);
A01N47/20 (EP,US);
A01N47/30 (EP,US);
A01N47/32 (EP,US);
A01N47/34 (EP,US);
A01N47/38 (EP,US);
C07C271/28 (EP,US);
C07C275/36 (EP,US);
C07C275/64 (EP,US);
C07C281/06 (EP,US);
C07C311/49 (EP,US);
C07C333/24 (EP,US);
C07C335/18 (EP,US);
C07C335/40 (EP,US);
C07C337/06 (EP,US);
C07D207/09 (EP,US);
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
C07D213/75 (EP,US);
C07D213/77 (EP,US);
C07D235/14 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D271/06 (EP,US);
C07D271/10 (EP,US);
C07D285/08 (EP,US);
C07D295/21 (EP,US);
C07D295/32 (EP,US);
C07D307/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | SI | 06.08.2001 | Title | German: | Derivate von Phenyl(thio)harnstoff und Phenyl(thio)carbamat Fungiziden | [2002/06] | English: | Derivatives of phenyl(thio)urea and phenyl(thio)carbamate fungicides | [2002/06] | French: | Dérivés de phényl(thio)urées et phényl(thio)carbamates fongicides | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 28.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Request for further processing for: | 06.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 06.05.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2004 | Decision despatched | 07.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.03.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.04.2007 | FI | 11.04.2007 | SE | 11.07.2007 | LU | 01.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 11.04.2007 | |
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | FI | 11.04.2007 | |
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 11.04.2007 | |
SE | 11.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4005223 (SIRRENBERG WILHELM, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 24 - line 45 * * example 14; table 2 *; | [XA]US4328248 (BOEGER MANFRED, et al) [X] 1-3 * example 2 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 15 * [A] 4-6; | [X]DE3102590 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-6 * page 9, line 23 - line 30 * * examples 71,130 * * claim 23 *; | [X]US4540578 (CHOU DAVID T [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * examples 21-24,40-42; table 1 *; | [X]US4914098 (BOEGER MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 19 - column 31 ** column 7, line 19 - line 56 *; | [X]US5066667 (EHRENFREUND JOSEF [CH], et al) [X] 1-3 * tables 1,2 *; | [X]US6083970 (MUELLER RUTH [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 37 - line 50 * * column 2, line 12 - line 39 * * table 3 * |