EP1209384 - Sealing ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cazier, Jean-Marc Cédex 1209 71290 Simandre / FR | For all designated states Gyllich, Per CPG A/ps Bakkegärdsvej 312 3050 Humlebaek / DK | [2002/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/22] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01420224.6 | 12.11.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | FR20000015297 | 27.11.2000 Original published format: FR 0015297 | [2002/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1209384 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1209384 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/16, F16J15/32 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
F16J15/164 (EP);
F16J15/3208 (EP);
F16J15/3232 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/08] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | 12.11.2002 | LT | 12.11.2002 | LV | 12.11.2002 | MK | 12.11.2002 | RO | 12.11.2002 | SI | 12.11.2002 | Title | German: | Dichtungsring | [2002/22] | English: | Sealing ring | [2002/22] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 06.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.02.2004 | FI | 18.02.2004 | IE | 18.02.2004 | TR | 18.02.2004 | GR | 18.05.2004 | PT | 18.07.2004 | LU | 12.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | CY | 18.02.2004 | |
FI | 18.02.2004 | ||
IE | 18.02.2004 | ||
TR | 18.02.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
LU | 12.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 18.02.2004 | |
IE | 18.02.2004 | ||
TR | 18.02.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 18.02.2004 | |
IE | 18.02.2004 | ||
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 18.02.2004 | |
GR | 18.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 18.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB841997 (ARMSTRONG PATENTS CO LTD) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 58-71 * * page 2, lines 99-104 * * figure 2 *; | [A]GB933588 (LESTER FRANK DALTON) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 59-78 * * figure . *; | [A]US4702482 (OSEMAN GAVIN S [GB]) [A] 1,3 * column 2, lines 44-65 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19611673 (ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,7 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 1 ** figure 2 *; | [A]DE19907883 (TOX PRESSOTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 4, lines 29-57 * * figures 1,2 * |