EP1217302 - Radiant heating device with rotary heat head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLICATION DES GAZ Lieudit le Favier, route de Brignais, BP 55 69563 Saint Genis Laval / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states APPLICATION DES GAZ Lieudit le Favier, route de Brignais, BP 55 69563 Saint Genis Laval / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Champion, Marc 55 allée du Jade, Domaine de la Veyrie 69890 La Tour de Salvagny / FR | 02 /
Cursoux, Bruno L'Orée du Village, Blvd. du Général de Gaulle 69440 Mornant / FR | 03 /
Huguet, Alain 36 rue nuzilly 69300 Caluire / FR | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01420237.8 | 18.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | FR20000016987 | 22.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0016987 | [2002/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1217302 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1217302 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24C1/12 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
F24C1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] | Title | German: | Strahlungsheizgerät mit drehbarem Heizkopf | [2004/12] | English: | Radiant heating device with rotary heat head | [2002/26] | French: | Dispositif chauffant radiant comportant une tête chauffante orientable | [2002/26] |
Former [2002/26] | Strahlheizgerät mit drehbarem Heizkopf | Examination procedure | 23.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 25.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | CY | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | IE | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | TR | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | LU | 18.12.2004 | ES | 26.12.2004 | BE | 31.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CY | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
LU | 18.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
BE | 31.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2764677 (COLLET JEAN [FR]) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 1,6 *; | [A]US5964233 (CLARK WALTER B [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract * |