12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
15.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
08.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
10.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
03.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
29.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] |
18.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
18.05.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
04.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
27.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
16.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
09.06.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] |
31.05.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.05.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.12.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.12.2005 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] |
07.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.06.2005 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
01.02.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.09.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
03.03.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.10.2003 |
First examination report |
|
28.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
17.01.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] |
22.11.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
26.04.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
26.04.2002 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
02.03.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |