Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1197436 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2006 | B1 | EP1197436 | 12.06.2002 | A3 | EP1197436 | 17.04.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR0012955 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE332846T | 15.08.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0012955 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2358142 | 21.09.2010 | C | CA2358142 | 10.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0012955 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60121401T | 22.02.2007 | T2 | DE60121401D1 | 24.08.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0012955 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2815014 | 21.03.2003 | B1 | FR2815014 | 12.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0012955 | 10.10.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6643992 | 11.11.2003 | B2 | US2002062627 | 30.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0012955 | 10.10.2000 |