EP1128607 - Flow integrity for path transitioning data switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoogenboom, Christopher L. 2230 Peninsula Road Oxnard, California 93030 / US | 02 /
Kowalski, Bob 112 Bridgewater Drive Vadnais Hights, Minnesota 55127 / US | 03 /
Wallner, John D. 12446 Presilla Road Camarillo, California 93010 / US | 04 /
Golio, Joe 12525 58th Avenue North Plymouth, Minnesota 55442 / US | 05 /
Wilson, Mike 503 Hillsborough Street Thousand Oaks, California 91361 / US | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/29] | Rausch, Gabriele Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | Schäfer, Wolfgang Dreiss Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Gerokstrasse 6 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01440025.3 | 05.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | US20000185153P | 18.02.2000 Original published format: US 185153 P | US20000718150 | 20.11.2000 Original published format: US 718150 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1128607 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1128607 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1128607 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L12/4641 (EP,US);
H04L45/58 (EP,US);
H04L45/7453 (EP,US);
H04L49/201 (EP,US);
H04L49/351 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/35] | H04L12/44, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/18] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsintegrität für Verbindungsübergang in einem Datenschalter | [2001/35] | English: | Flow integrity for path transitioning data switch | [2001/35] | French: | Intègrité de flux de données pour un conmutateur de données à transition de voies | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 16.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2006 | BE | 02.11.2006 | CH | 02.11.2006 | CY | 02.11.2006 | FI | 02.11.2006 | LI | 02.11.2006 | NL | 02.11.2006 | TR | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.02.2007 | SE | 02.02.2007 | GR | 03.02.2007 | IE | 05.02.2007 | LU | 05.02.2007 | ES | 13.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | PT | 02.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CY | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
LU | 05.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
IE | 05.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 02.11.2006 | |
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 02.11.2006 | |
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 02.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5884036 (HALEY ANDREW PAUL [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 26 - line 28 * * column 7, line 3 - line 24 * * column 7, line 54 - line 59 * * column 8, line 31 - line 33 *; | [A]US5884043 (TEPLITSKY JACOB [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 9, line 24 - line 65 ** column 10, line 14 - line 20 * |