EP1130855 - Selectable prioritization for data communication switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertagna, Drew 358 La Estrada Drive #27 San Jose, California 95123 / US | [2002/09] |
Former [2001/45] | 01 /
Bertagna, Drew 1286, Little Drive San Jose, California 95210 / US | ||
Former [2001/36] | 01 /
Bretagna, Drew 358 La Estrada Drive, 27 San Jose, California 95123 / US | Representative(s) | Rausch, Gabriele, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Rausch, Gabriele, Dr., et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/36] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01440030.3 | 14.02.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | US20000516849 | 02.03.2000 Original published format: US 516849 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130855 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130855 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1130855 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L12/44, H04L12/46 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H04L47/31 (EP,US);
H04L12/4641 (EP,US);
H04L45/7453 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/13 (EP,US);
H04L47/2458 (EP,US);
H04L49/205 (EP,US);
H04L12/4645 (EP,US);
H04L49/3018 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/36] | H04L12/44, H04L12/56, H04L12/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/36] | Title | German: | Prioirtätsauswahlverfahren für ein Datenkommunikationsschalter | [2001/36] | English: | Selectable prioritization for data communication switch | [2001/36] | French: | Procédé de sélection de priorité pour un conmutateur de communication de données | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 26.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2005 | BE | 13.04.2005 | CH | 13.04.2005 | CY | 13.04.2005 | FI | 13.04.2005 | LI | 13.04.2005 | NL | 13.04.2005 | TR | 13.04.2005 | DK | 13.07.2005 | GR | 13.07.2005 | SE | 13.07.2005 | ES | 24.07.2005 | PT | 13.09.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 13.04.2005 | |
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 13.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0003256 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [X] 1-26 * page 12, line 7 - page 13, line 28 * * page 32, line 3 - page 36, line 11 * * page 39, line 20 - page 42, line 24 * * page 46, line 11 - page 52, line 13 ** figures 2,14,17 *; | [PX]WO0056024 (BROADCOM CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-26 * page 18, line 1 - page 21, line 29 * * page 53, line 12 - page 80, line 12 * * page 83, line 10 - page 86, line 14 * * page 93, line 5 - page 103, line 4 * * figures 2,14,17 * |