EP1143762 - Apparatus and method for signal filtering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aschrafi, Bagher Schwenkgasse 63 73240 Wendlingen / DE | 02 /
Bäder, Rainer Neuffenstrasse 47 70771 Leinfelden / DE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Menzietti, Domenico, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Menzietti, Domenico, Dipl.-Ing, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01440040.2 | 22.02.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | DE2000111125 | 09.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10011125 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143762 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143762 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0471 (EP,US);
H04M11/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Filtern von Signalen | [2001/41] | English: | Apparatus and method for signal filtering | [2001/41] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de filtrage de signaux | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.06.2004 | IE | 09.06.2004 | NL | 09.06.2004 | TR | 09.06.2004 | DK | 09.09.2004 | GR | 09.09.2004 | SE | 09.09.2004 | ES | 20.09.2004 | PT | 09.11.2004 | AT | 22.02.2005 | CY | 22.02.2005 | LU | 22.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | CH | 28.02.2005 | LI | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
CY | 22.02.2005 | ||
LU | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
LU | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
TR | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
AT | 22.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
ES | 20.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
IE | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 09.06.2004 | |
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 09.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0760587 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 7 * column 3, lines 53-58 ** figure 2 *; | [A]EP0778683 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 6 * abstract * * column 14, lines 37-52 * * figure 20; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0923221 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * column 8, lines 21-44 * * column 9, line 11 - column 10, line 6 * * figures 3,5-7B; claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO9951019 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [X] 11-13 * abstract * * page 9, lines 18-31 * * page 10, lines 20-23 * * figures 7,8A,9; claims 1-4 *; | [XAY]WO9965217 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 11-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 7 * * page 4, lines 26-32 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 7 * * page 7, lines 28-34 * * page 8, lines 19-24 * * figures 1,3,4; claims 2,3,7,8 * [A] 3-10 [Y] 1,2; | [X]DE29914706U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 11-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 30 * * page 6, lines 18-37 * * figure 1; claims 1,2 * |