EP1164244 - Lifting device for a sash of a door, window or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERCO INTERNATIONAL Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment, Société Anonyme 2, rue du Vieux Moulin, Reding 57400 Sarrebourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states FERCO INTERNATIONAL Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment, Société Anonyme 2, rue du Vieux Moulin, Reding 57400 Sarrebourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klespert, Sylvain Village Perkins, 34, rue Auguste Renoir 57400 Sarrebourg / FR | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 17 Rue de la Forêt 67550 Vendenheim / FR | ||
Former [2001/51] | Rhein, Alain c/o Cabinet Bleger-Rhein, 8, Avenue Pierre Mendès France 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 01440173.1 | 14.06.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | FR20000007724 | 16.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0007724 | [2001/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1164244 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/51] | Classification | IPC: | E05F7/06, E05B15/00 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
E05F7/06 (EP);
E05C9/1808 (EP);
E05B15/0006 (EP);
E05C2009/1816 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anhebevorrichtung für den Flügel einer Tür, eines Fensters oder dergleichen | [2001/51] | English: | Lifting device for a sash of a door, window or the like | [2001/51] | French: | dispositif de relevage pour ouvrant de porte, fenêtre ou analogue | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |