EP1180883 - Distributed source learning for data communication switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hill, Rex A. 14360 Janal Way San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 02 /
Bailey, John 5940 Grey Rock Agoura Hills, CA 91301 / US | 03 /
Dietz, Bryan A. 24092 Brookfield Circle Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2002/08] | Wörz, Volker Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01440255.6 | 06.08.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | US20000639589 | 16.08.2000 Original published format: US 639589 | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1180883 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1180883 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1180883 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
H04L49/351 (EP,US);
H04L12/4625 (EP,US);
H04L45/742 (EP,US);
H04L47/34 (EP,US);
H04L49/201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/08] | Title | German: | Verteiltes Lernen von Quellen für eine Datenübertragungsvermittlungsstel | [2008/50] | English: | Distributed source learning for data communication switch | [2002/08] | French: | Procédé d'apprentissage de sources pour un commutateur de communication de données | [2002/08] |
Former [2002/08] | Lernendes Verfahren von Quellen für eine Datenübertragungsvermittlungsstelle | Examination procedure | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 22.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Request for further processing for: | 13.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.2009 | BE | 25.03.2009 | CY | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | IT | 25.03.2009 | NL | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | ES | 06.07.2009 | IE | 06.08.2009 | LU | 06.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | PT | 31.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IE | 06.08.2009 | ||
LU | 06.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
IT | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IE | 06.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IE | 06.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
IE | 06.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
PT | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
ES | 06.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 25.03.2009 | |
SE | 25.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0887970 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,61 * page 1, line 4 - page 14, line 46 *; | [X]WO9900945 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-64 * page 10, line 1 - page 14, line 3 * * page 20, line 18 - page 22, line 23 *; | [X]EP0993156 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-64 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 55 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 27 * * column 8, line 3 - column 8, line 49 * * column 10, line 31 - column 12, line 14 *; | [A]US6101188 (SEKINE MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-64 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 26 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 33 * * column 12, line 13 - column 13, line 43 ** figures 3,10 * |