EP1205358 - Vehicle cross bar to be mounted on non-parallel roof racks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wagon SAS Parc d'Activité du Moulin Jacquet Zone 2 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet 79300 Bressuire / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states WAGON SAS Parc d'Activité du Moulin Jacquet Zone 2 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet 79300 Bressuire / FR | ||
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states WAGON SAS Parc d'Activité du Moulin Jacquet Zonen 2 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet 79300 Bressuire / FR | ||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states WAGON AUTOMOTIVE SNC Route de Poitiers, Zone Industrielle No. 2, BP 59 79302 Bressuire Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neaux, Jean-Claude 8, chemin du Pas Bodin 79300 Terves / FR | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2005/12] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue Jouanet - B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2002/20] | Vidon, Patrice Le Nobel, 2, allée Antoine Becquerel BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01460069.6 | 14.11.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | FR20000014663 | 14.11.2000 Original published format: FR 0014663 | [2002/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205358 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205358 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60R9/045 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
B60R9/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/06] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugquerholm zur Montage auf nichtparalleler Dachreling | [2002/20] | English: | Vehicle cross bar to be mounted on non-parallel roof racks | [2002/20] | French: | Barre de galerie pour véhicules automobiles, destinée à être montée sur des longerons non parrallèles | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.07.2005 | IT | 27.07.2005 | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/35] | GB | 27.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8804994U (OPEL); | [A]DE3043970 (SKETEC VESUV [DE], et al); | [A]US5071050 (PUDNEY RICHARD I [US], et al); | [A]DE4223899 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]); | [DA]EP0664241 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al); | [A]US5758810 (STAPLETON CRAIG [US]); | [PX]EP1093971 (SCAMBIA IND DEV AG [LI]) [PX] 1,16,18 * paragraph [0029] * | by applicant | EP0664241 |