EP1126559 - Connector cover with compression element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lear Automotive (EEDS) Spain, S.L. Carrer Fuster s/n, Poligono Industrial Valls 43800 Valls Tarragona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states Lear Automotive (EEDS) Spain, S.L. Carrer Fuster s/n, Poligono Industrial Valls 43800 Valls, Tarragona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matamoros Bonillo, Josep C/De las Alzines, 11 Urbanizacion Erboseres 43392 Castellvell del Camp Tarragona / ES | [2001/43] |
Former [2001/34] | 01 /
Matamoros Bonilla, Josep Carrer Fuster S/N Poligono Industrial Valls 43800 Valls (Tarragona) / ES | Representative(s) | Primo de Rivera y Urquijo, Jose A. General Martinez Campos, 51 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Primo de Rivera y Urquijo, Jose Antonio General Martinez Campos, 51 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 01500011.0 | 12.01.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | ES20000000146 | 25.01.2000 Original published format: ES 200000146 | [2001/34] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1126559 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/533 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
H01R13/533 (EP);
H01R13/5825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/21] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verbinderabdeckung mit Druckelement | [2001/34] | English: | Connector cover with compression element | [2001/34] | French: | Couvercle pour connecteur ayant un élément de compression | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/13] | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2779012 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 15 * * page 3, line 29 - line 34; figures 5,6 * [A] 3; | [A]US5597330 (HATAGISHI YUJI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 35 - line 63; figures 1,3-4B *; | [A]US5876235 (YOSHIGI TOSHIMASA [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 2; figures 1C,2A * |