EP1137323 - Sensor circuit for detecting the presence of a pan on an electric cooking hob [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eika, S.Coop Ctra. Urresolo, 47 48277 Etxebarria / ES | [2001/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arbe Aurre, Ismael C. Urbitarte 8, 1 D 48270 Markina (Bizkaia) / ES | 02 /
Mitxelena Alzuri, José M. C. Sagastialdeberri, 24 20120 Hernani (Gipuzkoa) / ES | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Fernandez Guzman, Juan Apartado 213, Barrio San Andres s/n 20500 Mondragon (Gipuzkoa) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Fernandez Guzman, Juan Apartado 213, Barrio San Andres s/n 20500 Mondragon (Gipuzkoa) / ES | Application number, filing date | 01500048.2 | 26.02.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | ES20000000717 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: ES 200000717 | ES20000002818 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: ES 200002818 | [2001/39] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1137323 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1137323 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1137323 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/74 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
H05B3/746 (EP,US);
H05B2213/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/39] | Title | German: | Sensorvorrichtung zum Erfassen der Anwesenheit eines Topfes auf einer Elektrokochplatte | [2001/39] | English: | Sensor circuit for detecting the presence of a pan on an electric cooking hob | [2001/39] | French: | Circuit de détection destiné à détecter la présence d'une casserole sur une plaque de cuisson électrique | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 02.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2006 | BE | 26.04.2006 | CH | 26.04.2006 | CY | 26.04.2006 | FI | 26.04.2006 | IT | 26.04.2006 | LI | 26.04.2006 | NL | 26.04.2006 | TR | 26.04.2006 | DK | 26.07.2006 | SE | 26.07.2006 | GR | 27.07.2006 | PT | 26.09.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
CY | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
IT | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
GR | 27.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
IT | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
GR | 27.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
IT | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
NL | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
BE | 26.04.2006 | ||
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
DK | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
PT | 26.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
CH | 26.04.2006 | ||
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
LI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 26.04.2006 | |
FI | 26.04.2006 | ||
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 26.04.2006 | |
SE | 26.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 26.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4334135 (SMITH PETER H) [X] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]EP0553425 (WHIRLPOOL EUROP [NL]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * * column 6, line 41 - line 47 * * column 8, line 15 - line 23 * * column 8, line 39 - line 46 *; | [X]US5296684 (ESSIG WILLI [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 4, line 1 - line 40; figure 3 * * column 5, line 29 - line 35 * * column 2, line 26 - line 37 * * column 3, line 17 - line 26 * |