EP1152105 - Modular fence [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saura Sotillos, Juan Jose Ctra. Villaverde-Vallecas, 295 28031 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Saura Sotillos, Jorge Antonio Ctra. Villaverde-Vallecas, 295 28031 Madrid / ES | [2001/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Davila Baz, Angel Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Davila Baz, Angel c/o Clarke, Modet & Co., C/Goya, Nr. 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 01500117.5 | 04.05.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | ES20000001137 | 05.05.2000 Original published format: ES 200001137 | ES20010000442U | 26.02.2001 Original published format: ES 200100442 U | [2001/45] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152105 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1152105 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152105 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04H17/16 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
E04H17/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | 21.11.2003 | LT | 21.11.2003 | LV | 21.11.2003 | MK | 21.11.2003 | RO | 21.11.2003 | SI | 21.11.2003 | Title | German: | Modularer Zaun | [2001/45] | English: | Modular fence | [2001/45] | French: | Clôture modulaire | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 01.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.07.2007 | BE | 04.07.2007 | CH | 04.07.2007 | CY | 04.07.2007 | DK | 04.07.2007 | FI | 04.07.2007 | LI | 04.07.2007 | TR | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.10.2007 | GR | 05.10.2007 | PT | 04.12.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
PT | 04.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1764584 (TARRIER FRED A); | [A]EP0098328 (ROESLER DRAHT AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4207104 (MERSCH UWE [DE], et al) [A] 2 * abstract * |