EP1262111 - An apparatus for pressing granular food material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meincke A/S Tonsbakken 10 2740 Skovlunde / DK | [2002/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henrichs, Holger Norrevaenget 94 3500 Vaerlose / DK | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Joergensen, Bjoern Barker, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Jorgensen, Bjorn Barker, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau, Hoje Taastrup Boulevard 23 2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 01610057.0 | 31.05.2001 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1262111 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A23P1/10, A23L1/164, B01J2/22, B30B11/12, A23P1/02 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
B01J2/22 (EP);
A23L7/126 (EP);
A23P10/25 (EP);
A23P30/10 (EP);
B30B11/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Pressen von körnigen Nahrungsmitteln | [2002/49] | English: | An apparatus for pressing granular food material | [2002/49] | French: | Appareil de compression de produits alimentaires granulaires | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 17.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 02.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB175035 (FRITZ KILIAN) [X] 1-4,6 * figure . * * page 3, line 7 - line 14 *; | [X]FR973630 (L.SAUSSARD) [X] 1-4,6 * figures 1,4 *; | [X]US4567714 (CHASMAN SYDNEY A [US]) [X] 1-6 * figure 8 * * column 16, line 8 - column 18, line 11 * * column 20, line 63 - column 21, line 16 *; | [X]FR2127456 (HELY JOLY GEORGES) [X] 1,4,6 * page 1, line 1 - line 15 * * page 3, line 13 - line 29 * * page 4, line 5 - line 9 * * figure 2 *; | [X]US3504639 (LILIEN BENJAMIN) [X] 1,4-6 * column 1, line 10 - line 31 * * column 3, line 27 - line 66 * * column 4, line 15 - line 19 * * figures 2,4 *; | [X]US1960367 (FRIEDRICH BELLINGROTH) [X] 1-4,6 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 48 - line 51 * * page 2, line 87 - line 92 *; | [X]US5158785 (KOENIG HELMUT [AT]) [X] 1-4,6 * figures 1,3,5 * * column 4, line 26 - line 54 * * column 5, line 12 - line 21 * * column 6, line 5 - line 10 *; | [AD]EP0715814 (BARILLA FLLI G & R [IT]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * |