EP1123759 - Method for corrugating a metal foil and metal foil obtained by such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/33] | Method for corrugating a metal foil and packages of such foil | ||
[2004/38] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOCAT OY Vihtavuorentie 162 41330 Vihtavuori / FI | [2004/50] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states Kemira Metalkat Oy P.O. Box 20 41331 Vihtavuori / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nilsson, Sven Melker Smakullevägen 18 428 35 Kallered / SE | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/42] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/33] | Heikkinen, Esko Juhani, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01660027.2 | 07.02.2001 | [2001/33] | Priority number, date | SE20000000429 | 11.02.2000 Original published format: SE 0000429 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1123759 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1123759 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123759 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1123759 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21D13/04, B21D53/02, B31F1/26 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
B31F1/24 (EP,US);
B21D13/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12382 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1241 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/33] | B21D13/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2004/44] |
Former [2004/41] | DE, FI, FR, GB | ||
Former [2004/26] | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Wellen eines Blattmaterials sowie durch dieses Verfahren hergestellte Folie | [2004/38] | English: | Method for corrugating a metal foil and metal foil obtained by such a method | [2004/38] | French: | Procédé pour onduler un matériau en feuille et feuille obtenue par un tel procédé | [2004/38] |
Former [2001/33] | Verfahren zum Wellen eines Blattmaterials und Packungen von einer solchen Folie | ||
Former [2001/33] | Method for corrugating a metal foil and packages of such foil | ||
Former [2001/33] | Méthode pour onduler un matériau en feuille et emballage d'une telle feuille | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 30.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2006
31.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 128 D-53797 Lohmar / DE Opponent's representative Rössler, Matthias, et al, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2006
Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 128 D-53797 Lohmar / DE Opponent's representative Rössler, Matthias, et al, et al KNH Patentanwälte, Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser, Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 24.02.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.09.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.10.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.04.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.04.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.12.2007 | Appeal received No. T2015/07 | 29.02.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.04.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 19.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.04.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3958626 (KLEIN LEE F) [A] 5,6* figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5819575 (KOBAYASHI HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure 1A *; | [DA]US5983692 (BRUECK ROLF [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * figures 1,2 * | Opposition | EP0484364 | SE8702771 | JPS577221 | WO9008249 | JPH02261518 | JPH0377730 | US5085268 | WO9302792 | JPH09174180 | JPH10249213 |