EP1133215 - Method and ignition circuit for switching a high pressure lamp on and off [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helvar Oy Ab Purotie 3 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2001/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viljanen, Teijo Kromitie 17 02700 Kauniainen / FI | 02 /
Luomala, Jukka Kolohongankuja 3 as 29 01260 Vantaa / FI | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | LEITZINGER OY Ruoholahdenkatu 8 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01660040.5 | 02.03.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | FI20000000505 | 06.03.2000 Original published format: FI 20000505 | [2001/37] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1133215 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1133215 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/04 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
H05B41/042 (EP);
H05B41/2925 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2004/40] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltung zum Zünden einer Hochdruckentladungslampe | [2001/37] | English: | Method and ignition circuit for switching a high pressure lamp on and off | [2001/37] | French: | Procédé et circuit d'amorçage d'une lampe à décharge haute pression | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/19] | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/19] | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5962988 (NUCKOLLS JOE ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * figures 13,14,16-19 *; | [DA]WO9708921 (TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE [AT], et al) |