EP1151785 - Method for purification of exhaust gas in a composting process and for heat recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAPO OY P.O. Box 22 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | [2001/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nummela, Jyri Tellervonkatu 15 B 7 40200 Jyväskylä / FI | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Helke, Kimmo Kalervo Kespat Oy, P.O. Box 601 40101 Jyväskylä / FI | Application number, filing date | 01660080.1 | 02.05.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | FI20000001034 | 04.05.2000 Original published format: FI 20001034 | [2001/45] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1151785 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1151785 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/58, B01D53/78, C05F17/02 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
B01D53/58 (EP);
C05F17/15 (EP);
Y02P20/145 (EP);
Y02W30/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FI, SE [2003/35] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Abgasen in einem Kompostierungsverfahren und zur Rückgewinnung von Wärme | [2001/45] | English: | Method for purification of exhaust gas in a composting process and for heat recovery | [2001/45] | French: | Procédé pour la purification de gaz produits dans un procédé de compostage et pour la récupération de chaleur | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 05.06.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.09.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | 23.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5145581 (NOVY VLADIMIR A [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 4, lines 29-46 * * column 6, lines 40-58; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4559210 (DIEMER PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9607624 (BJERAGER PER EDUARD ROBERT [DK]) [A] 1-8 * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 18 * * page 11, line 19 - page 12, line 15; figure - * |