EP1174367 - Pallet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Oyj Eteläesplanadi 2 00130 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene OYJ Eteläesplanadi 2 00130 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene OYJ Eteläesplanadi 2 00170 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vilkki, Antti Juokslahdentie 31 42300 Jänsänkoski / FI | [2006/32] |
Former [2002/04] | 01 /
Vikki, Antti Juokslahdentie 31 42300 Jänsänkoski / FI | Representative(s) | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01660141.1 | 18.07.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | DE2000135411 | 20.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10035411 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1174367 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1174367 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/12 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
B65D88/129 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/04] | Title | German: | Palette | [2002/04] | English: | Pallet | [2002/04] | French: | Palette | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2007 | BE | 03.01.2007 | CH | 03.01.2007 | CY | 03.01.2007 | DK | 03.01.2007 | FI | 03.01.2007 | IT | 03.01.2007 | LI | 03.01.2007 | NL | 03.01.2007 | TR | 03.01.2007 | SE | 03.04.2007 | GR | 04.04.2007 | ES | 14.04.2007 | PT | 04.06.2007 | IE | 18.07.2007 | LU | 18.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CY | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IT | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
IE | 18.07.2007 | ||
LU | 18.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
CY | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IT | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
IE | 18.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IT | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
IE | 18.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IT | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
BE | 03.01.2007 | ||
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 03.01.2007 | |
CH | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
LI | 03.01.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 03.01.2007 | |
PT | 04.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2259779 (SALEN INTERDEVELOP AB [SE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 5; figure 3 *; | [A]US4015715 (KELF MICHAEL A) [A] 1,6,14,15,19,20* column W *; | [A]US4416385 (CLARE KENNETH D [GB], et al) [A] 1-3,19,20 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US5183375 (FENTON GARY L [US], et al) [A] 1-4,19,20 * column W * |