EP1146008 - Horse bit with lateral parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herm. Sprenger GmbH & Co. KG Alexanderstrasse 10-21 58644 Iserlohn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states HERM. SPRENGER GmbH & Co. KG Alexanderstrasse 10-21 D-58644 Iserlohn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claus, Ralf Rott 35 42283 Wuppertal / DE | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Bayenthalgürtel 15 50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | Application number, filing date | 01710003.3 | 18.01.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | DE20001001841 | 13.04.2000 Original published format: DE 10001841 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1146008 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Classification | IPC: | B68B1/06 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
B68B1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pferdegebiss mit einem Gebissstück und mit Seitenteilen | [2001/42] | English: | Horse bit with lateral parts | [2001/42] | French: | Mors pour cheval, avec éléments latéraux | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/12] | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | DE4326550 |