EP1225465 - Optical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optosys SA Route André Piller 50 1762 Givisiez / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Optosys SA route André Piller 50 1762 Givisiez / CH | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Optosys SA route André Piller 50 1762 Givisiez / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhême, Charles imp. du Coutset 10 1725 Posieux / CH | 02 /
Heimlicher, Peter Klein-Schönberg 112 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2002/30] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | AMMANN INGENIEURS-CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INTELLECTUELLE SA BERNE Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810053.7 | 19.01.2001 | [2002/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1225465 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225465 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
G02B6/4206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2003/16] |
Former [2002/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optische Vorrichtung | [2002/30] | English: | Optical device | [2002/30] | French: | Dispositif optique | [2002/30] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 25.01.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH | 26.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5740291 (DE LASA HUGO I [CA], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5190536 (WOOD LEROY [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6,7 * figure 10 *; | [A]US4695697 (KOSA NADHIR B [US]) [A] 1,3,7 * figures 2-6 *; | [A]FR2763138 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [A] 1,3,7 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO9904857 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,3,7 * figure 3 * |