Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
29.08.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] |
27.08.2003 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
26.06.2003 | Change - extension states | |
07.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
14.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights | |
28.02.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
27.02.2003 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
24.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
23.12.2002 | Renewal fee | |
04.10.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
07.06.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] |