Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1225465 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2003 | B1 | EP1225465 | 24.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01810053 | 19.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60100984T | 12.08.2004 | T2 | DE60100984D1 | 20.11.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP01810053 | 19.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6654519 | 25.11.2003 | B2 | US2002097959 | 25.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP01810053 | 19.01.2001 |