EP1125663 - Drilling tool for stone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Opposition rejected | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | ||
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauptmann, Udo Kalkbrenner Strasse 1b 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | 02 /
Pröls, Tim Grandauerstrasse 63 80997 München / DE | [2001/34] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2014/37] |
Former [2001/34] | Wildi, Roland, et al Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 01810116.2 | 06.02.2001 | [2001/34] | Priority number, date | DE20001006932 | 16.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10006932 | [2001/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1125663 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1125663 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1125663 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/02 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
B23B51/02 (EP,US);
B23B2222/28 (EP,US);
B23B2226/75 (EP,US);
B23B2251/204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2003/09] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bohrwerkzeug für Gestein | [2001/34] | English: | Drilling tool for stone | [2001/34] | French: | Outil de forage pour la pierre | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2010
15.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US Opponent's representative SBD IPAdmin, et al, et al 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2010
15.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US Opponent's representative SBD IPAdmin, et al, et al 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2010
Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark DE 19711 / US Opponent's representative Clayton-Hathway, Anthony Nicholas, et al, et al Black & Decker European Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | 16.04.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.08.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.06.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.06.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 04.04.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/24] | Appeal following opposition | 16.08.2013 | Appeal received No. T1767/13 | 24.10.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.04.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 07.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | NL | 01.09.2010 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/07] | CH | 28.02.2010 | |
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | CH | 28.02.2010 | |
LI | 28.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0884448 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10 * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 37 * * figure 2 * [A] 6 [Y] 4,7; | [Y]DE29819388U (KEIL WERKZEUGFABRIK KARL EISCH [DE]) [Y] 4,7 * page 6, line 20 - line 25 * * figures 1B,3 * * page 7, line 24 - line 35 * |