EP1243748 - Double-cone device and pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DCT Double-Cone Technology AG Allmendstrasse 86 3602 Thun / CH | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stark, John Grundbachstrasse 7x 3665 Wattenwil / CH | 02 /
Wagenbach, Hansjörg Bözingenstrasse 38 2502 Biel / CH | 03 /
Schär, Jörg Bodenackerweg 20 3053 Münchenbuchsee / CH | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Störzbach, Michael Andreas Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Störzbach, Michael Andreas Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | ||
Former [2002/39] | Störzbach, Michael Andreas Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810262.4 | 16.03.2001 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243748 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/12, E21B31/00, F04F5/44, F04F5/46 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
E21B43/129 (EP,US);
F04F5/10 (EP,US);
F04F5/44 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/24] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Pumpe mit Doppelkegel | [2002/39] | English: | Double-cone device and pump | [2002/39] | French: | Dispositif et pompe à double cône | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 25.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.05.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.05.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4603735 (BLACK JOHN B [US]) [X] 5 * column 4, lines 30-52 * * figures 2,5,6 *; | [AD]US4792284 (STRAUB PAUL W [CH], et al) [AD] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5488993 (HERSHBERGER MICHAEL D [US]) [A] 1,5* the whole document *; | [AD]WO0116493 (DCT DOUBLE CONE TECHNOLOGY AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1,5 * claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0232391 | US4792284 | CH669823 | CH671810 | WO2001CH00403 |