EP1149952 - Noise reduction wall for exterior [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hofzaun GmbH Weiherstrasse 8 8472 Seuzach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Hofzaun GmbH Weiherstrasse 8 8472 Seuzach / DE | ||
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Flück, Ulrich Landstrasse 31 8472 Seuzach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flück, Ulrich Landstrasse 31 8472 Seuzach / CH | [2002/09] |
Former [2001/44] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Breiter, Heinz Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Stadthausstrasse 145 Postfach 2005 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Breiter, Heinz Breiter + Partner AG Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach / CH | ||
Former [2001/44] | Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810385.3 | 20.04.2001 | [2001/44] | Priority number, date | CH20150200008 | 26.04.2000 Original published format: CH 20000815 | [2001/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1149952 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1149952 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E01F8/00 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
E01F8/0023 (EP);
E01F8/0011 (EP);
E01F8/0076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/44] | Title | German: | Aussenschallschutzwand | [2001/44] | English: | Noise reduction wall for exterior | [2001/44] | French: | Mur anti-bruit pour extérieur | [2008/37] |
Former [2001/44] | Mur anti-bruit pour exterieur | Examination procedure | 07.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 04.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0701024 (CYCROLLO AG [CH]) [A] 1-3,10 * abstract *; | [A]DE3322189 (SF VOLLVERBUNDSTEIN [DE]) |