EP1255074 - Oscillation reduction in a combustion chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weisenstein, Wolfgang Mattächer 5a 5453 Remetschwil / CH | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2004/34] |
Former [2002/45] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810429.9 | 01.05.2001 | [2002/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255074 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255074 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F23D11/36 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
F23D11/36 (EP,US);
F23D2210/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2003/30] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schwingungsreduktion in einer Brennkammer | [2002/45] | English: | Oscillation reduction in a combustion chamber | [2002/45] | French: | Diminution des oscillations dans une chambre de combustion | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 08.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0962704 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 4, line 5 - line 43 * * column 5, line 41 - line 52 * * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 48 * * column 8, line 19 - line 56 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6202401 (SEUME JOERG [DE], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 10 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 52 * * column 7, line 3 - line 29 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19849300 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 5, line 41 - page 6, line 3 * * figures 2,3 * |